Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 456 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5443 Week
» 13558 Month
» 141001 Year
» 1806377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46500 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2192
To Service During 03/1952 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/01/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cohens (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18A   Toton (New) m/e 03/1952
18B   Westhouses 4w/e 19/04/1952
18A   Toton 4w/e 17/05/1952
18A   Toton 8w/e 14/06/1952
18C   Hasland 4w/e 16/05/1953
17A   Derby w/e 10/01/1959
8L   Aintree w/e 23/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 07/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18A Toton on 15/03/1952
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 07/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46500
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2192
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
07/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46500    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Ickles    

prev prev