Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 427 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5414 Week
» 13529 Month
» 140972 Year
» 1806348 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46502 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2194
To Service During 03/1952 to Nottingham (16A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
16A   Nottingham (New) m/e 03/1952
17A   Derby w/e 10/01/1959
8L   Aintree w/e 23/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 16A Nottingham on 03/05/1952
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 25/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46502
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2194
Allocated to Nottingham (16A)
   
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
25/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46502    
06/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev