Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46506 on 27/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 394
To Service Sat 27/11/1952 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
89A   Oswestry (New) on 27/11/1952
89A   Oswestry 4w/e 29/11/1952
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 29/12/1956
89A   Oswestry 4w/e 31/10/1959
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/08/1960
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962
1A   Willesden w/e 30/03/1963
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 25/05/1963
16D   Nottingham w/e 07/12/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/05/1964
12C   Barrow in Furness w/e 27/06/1964
9M   Bury w/e 10/10/1964
9K   Bolton w/e 10/04/1965
9D   Newton Heath w/e 13/08/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 29/11/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC IA   4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 12C Barrow in Furness 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9M Bury w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1959 Brecon demotion Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. SLS/196002
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46506
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (9M)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
13/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46506    
11/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev