|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1959 | Brecon demotion | Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. | SLS/196002 |
08/09/1962 | Last Trains | The last train from Cardigan to Whitland on Saturday, 8th September was hauled by 2-6-2Ts 4557 an 4569. The last train from Kingham to Cheltenham on Saturday, 13th October, was hauled by 2-6-2T 4109 . The last trains from Neath-Brecon and return on Saturday, 13th October, were run in duplicate; 3652 and four coaches left Neath R. at 3-40 p.m. and 3621/93 and five coaches formed the service train at 4-10 p.m. to Brecon. The relief train left Brecon piloted by 2-6-0 46516 (tender first) as far as Colbren Junction and the service train left at 7-30 p.m. (with panniers 3621 and 3693) and arrived Neath 100 minutes late. 46516 returned to Brecon after passage of service train and the Brecon-Sennybridge section was kept open till Wednesday, 17th October for cattle sale traffic. | SLS/196211 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/01/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 46516 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oswestry (89A) |
||
08/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brecon (89B) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
23/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
19/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (8E) | ||
05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46516 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |