Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 431 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5418 Week
» 13533 Month
» 140976 Year
» 1806352 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46523 on 05/03/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 394
To Service Sat 05/03/1953 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
89A   Oswestry (New) on 05/03/1953
89B   Brecon 4w/e 18/04/1953
89A   Oswestry 4w/e 01/01/1955
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 09/02/1963
26A   Newton Heath w/e 17/08/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 21/03/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1953
ALLOC 89B Brecon 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/04/1962 Brecon MPD Despite the allocation of code 88K since January, 1961, no locomotive allocation has been made or shed plates cast; Ebbw Junc. and Oswestry supply locomotives as before. On 22nd April, the following were on shed-2218/40/7, 3691, 3706/14 of 86A and 46507/9/10/21/3 of 89D. Normally, two Brecon engines stable at Builth Road H.L. shed and on 22nd April these were 46508/19 of 89D. SLS/196206
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46523
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brecon (89B)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46523    
11/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev