Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2975 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16381 Week
» 69397 Month
» 188924 Year
» 3215777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13014 |
on |
17/03/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2714 |
|
19/08/1935 |
British Railways |
42714 |
|
10/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
84 |
To Service |
Sat 17/03/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/09/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 08/12/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
17/03/1927 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
EXLOAN |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
19/04/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13014 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
19/08/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2714 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42714 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42714 |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|