Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13015 on 14/04/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2715   14/06/1934
British Railways 42715   12/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 84
To Service Sat 14/04/1927
Withdrawal Sat 26/02/1966
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/04/1927
26B   Agecroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath w/e 11/02/1950
26C   Bolton w/e 23/01/1960
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 06/02/1960
27B   Aintree w/e 05/11/1960
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 17/03/1962
27B   Aintree w/e 22/06/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 23/11/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 12/06/1965
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 30/10/1965
     Withdrawn on 26/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 26/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/04/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13015
Built at Horwich Works
   
14/06/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2715    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
12/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42715    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
26/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42715    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev