Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 242 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1943 Week
» 10058 Month
» 137501 Year
» 1802877 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13021 on 03/08/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2721   25/06/1935
British Railways 42721   19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 84
To Service Sat 03/08/1927
Withdrawal Sat 12/10/1963
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/08/1927
26B   Agecroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 17/03/1962
26C   Bolton w/e 18/05/1963
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 22/06/1963
9J   Agecroft w/e 21/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 12/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 26B Agecroft w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 12/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/08/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13021
Built at Horwich Works
   
25/06/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2721    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
19/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42721    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
12/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42721    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev