Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 53 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2979 Week
» 4717 Month
» 132160 Year
» 1797536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13027 on 31/10/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2727   02/07/1935
British Railways 42727   17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 84
To Service Sat 31/10/1927
Withdrawal Sat 07/01/1967
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 31/10/1927
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 31/12/1950
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 19/06/1954
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
10F   Rose Grove w/e 11/01/1964
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/08/1965
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 07/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 27B Aintree m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 09/04/1966
WDN   w/e 07/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13027
Built at Horwich Works
   
02/07/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2727    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
17/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42727    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
19/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
07/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42727    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev