Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13028 on 18/11/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2728   29/11/1934
British Railways 42728   05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 84
To Service Sat 18/11/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/02/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 25/05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/11/1927
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 31/12/1950
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 19/06/1954
24B   Rose Grove w/e 12/11/1960
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 08/04/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 16/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 27B Aintree m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 16/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13028
Built at Horwich Works
   
29/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2728    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
05/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42728    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
16/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42728    
25/05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev