|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/12/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13029 Built at Horwich Works |
||
14/12/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2729 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
09/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42729 | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B) | ||
14/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
28/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
12/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42729 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dudley Hill |