Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 443 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5430 Week
» 13545 Month
» 140988 Year
» 1806364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13032 m/e 12/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2732   20/09/1935
British Railways 42732 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 325
To Service During 12/1926
Withdrawal Sat 12/06/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1926
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 22/06/1946
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree w/e 25/08/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 08/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 19/06/1954
24F   Fleetwood 4w/e 23/02/1957
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 12/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   w/e 12/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/04/1962 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13032
Built at Crewe Works
   
20/09/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2732    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
19/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42732    
25/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
12/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42732    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev