Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 53 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2979 Week
» 4717 Month
» 132160 Year
» 1797536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13033 m/e 12/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2733   09/04/1935
British Railways 42733   14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 325
To Service During 12/1926
Withdrawal Sat 20/02/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1926
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23B   Aintree w/e 29/05/1948
24B   Rose Grove w/e 02/10/1948
24B   Rose Grove m/e 31/12/1950
24A   Accrington 4w/e 06/09/1952
27B   Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
62A   Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/11/1953
62B   Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 26/12/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 24/04/1954
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 19/06/1954
9G   Gorton w/e 27/07/1963
9K   Bolton w/e 25/04/1964
9G   Gorton w/e 10/10/1964
     Withdrawn on 20/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
LOAN 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 26/12/1953
EXLOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   w/e 20/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13033
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/04/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2733    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (23B)    
14/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42733    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
20/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42733    
06/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev