Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13077 on 27/09/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2777   22/02/1935
British Railways 42777   14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 325
To Service Sat 27/09/1927
Withdrawal Sat 14/08/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/09/1927
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5B   Crewe South 4w/e 03/10/1953
2A   Rugby w/e 15/08/1959
5B   Crewe South w/e 16/01/1960
5D   Stoke w/e 13/06/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/07/1962
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 14/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 14/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 2A Rugby 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 14/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/09/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13077
Built at Crewe Works
   
22/02/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2777    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
14/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42777    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
13/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
14/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42777    
03/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev