Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16293 Week
» 69309 Month
» 188836 Year
» 3215689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13081 |
on |
17/09/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2781 |
|
25/10/1934 |
British Railways |
42781 |
|
09/09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Sat 17/09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 12/01/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
17/09/1927 |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5A |
|
Crewe North |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
6A |
|
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
30/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13081 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
25/10/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2781 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42781 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42781 |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|