Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 48 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14091 Week
» 79045 Month
» 281709 Year
» 3308562 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13083 |
on |
24/09/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2783 |
|
03/04/1935 |
British Railways |
42783 |
|
16/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Sat 24/09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/08/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13083 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
03/04/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2783 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42783 |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42783 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|