|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/04/1962 | Horwich Works (Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13089 Built at Crewe Works |
||
30/04/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2789 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) | ||
10/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42789 | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
21/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (55F) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
26/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42789 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |