Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17575 Week
» 70591 Month
» 190118 Year
» 3216971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13115 |
on |
18/06/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2815 |
|
21/05/1935 |
British Railways |
42815 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
87 |
To Service |
Sat 18/06/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/09/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13115 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
21/05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2815 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42815 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
20/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42815 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|