Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 719 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14762 Week
» 79716 Month
» 282380 Year
» 3309233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13120 |
on |
20/08/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2820 |
|
11/01/1935 |
British Railways |
42820 |
|
14/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
87 |
To Service |
Sat 20/08/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/04/1964 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
20/08/1929 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26D |
|
Bury |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/04/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/08/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13120 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
11/01/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2820 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42820 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42820 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|