|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Horwich Works (Moss Side) | Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1930 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13139 Built at Horwich Works |
||
11/10/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2839 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
27/08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42839 | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
06/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42839 | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |