Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 316 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2017 Week
» 10132 Month
» 137575 Year
» 1802951 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) 13164 on 09/04/1930
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2864   04/09/1934
British Railways 42864   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class CRAB
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 342
To Service Sat 09/04/1930
Withdrawal Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/04/1930
26B   Agecroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree w/e 07/02/1959
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 12/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   on 20/07/1961
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1961 First Crabs condemned The first three Hughes Class 6P5F 2-6-0 locos. to be withdrawn were 42864 an 42893 of Sheffield Grimesthorpe (411B), and 42930 of Canklow (41D); simultaneously condemned in July. In view of the present trend, it is hardly surprising that the first inroads have been made into the 'Crabs'. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1930 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13164
Built at Crewe Works
   
04/09/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2864    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42864    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42864    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev