Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 4255 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17661 Week
» 70677 Month
» 190204 Year
» 3217057 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13191 |
on |
30/07/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2891 |
|
16/08/1934 |
British Railways |
42891 |
|
11/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
345 |
To Service |
Sat 30/07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/10/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
30/07/1930 |
3D |
|
Aston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
2B |
|
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
2B |
|
Nuneaton |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
21/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13191 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
16/08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2891 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42891 |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
20/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42891 |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|