Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4083 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17489 Week
» 70505 Month
» 190032 Year
» 3216885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13192 |
on |
01/08/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2892 |
|
20/11/1934 |
British Railways |
42892 |
|
22/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
345 |
To Service |
Sat 01/08/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/05/1965 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/08/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13192 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
20/11/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2892 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42892 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42892 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|