Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17266 Week
» 70282 Month
» 189809 Year
» 3216662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13232 |
on |
06/06/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2932 |
|
10/08/1934 |
British Railways |
42932 |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Sat 06/06/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 01/05/1965 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13232 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
10/08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2932 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42932 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42932 |
|
|