Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13235 |
on |
12/12/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2935 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
42935 |
|
28/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
367 |
To Service |
Sat 12/12/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/01/1963 |
Service Life |
30 yrs , 1 mth |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 04/05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13235 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2935 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42935 |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42935 |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|