Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3883 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13457 Week
» 78411 Month
» 281075 Year
» 3307928 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15522 |
on |
12/01/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
23 |
on |
06/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40023 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/01/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/11/1959 off Cricklewood East (14A) |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14C |
St Albans |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
15/03/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
13/04/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
01/11/1952 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/01/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15522 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
13/04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
06/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 23 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40023 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40023 from Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|