Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17327 Week
» 70343 Month
» 189870 Year
» 3216723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15529 |
on |
02/03/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
30 |
on |
06/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40030 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 02/03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/08/1959 off Kentish Town (14B) |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
16/05/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15529 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
16/05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
06/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40030 |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (68D) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40030 from Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|