Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1199 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19002 Week
» 72018 Month
» 191545 Year
» 3218398 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15540 |
on |
27/05/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
41 |
on |
12/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40041 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/05/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 01/10/1960 off Carnforth (24L) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
27/05/1931 |
11A |
|
Carnforth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
06/09/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/04/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
16/07/1949 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15540 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
06/04/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
12/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40041 |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40041 from Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|