Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4722 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20334 Week
» 118979 Month
» 321643 Year
» 3348496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15548 |
on |
27/07/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
49 |
on |
15/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40049 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/07/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/07/1961 off Willesden (1A) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 21/09/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
13/06/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
24/01/1948 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/01/1948 |
Derby Works |
Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were Nos. M49, M2192, M2319, and M4291 on the shed, and M2520 In the Paint Shop. New construction in the Erecting Shop was 2193 (complete), 2194 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted), 2195/6 (frames and cylinders only). In the Diesel Shop were Nos. 7130/1, both practically complete, and 10000, which had returned for reinforcement of fuel tanks. The frames of No. 10001 were seen in the Heavy Machine Shop, but little progress has been made as yet |
SLS/194803 |
21/02/1959 |
Muirkirk-Lanark |
the Muirkirk-Lanark passenger service is now being worked by 2-6-2T 40049. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/07/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15548 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
15/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49 |
|
|
13/06/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40049 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40049 from Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|