Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 825 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1899 Week
» 27260 Month
» 260180 Year
» 1925556 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 71 on 15/02/1935
British Railways 40071 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 15/02/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/12/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/02/1935
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
24L     4w/e 22/03/1958
6H   Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 11A Carnforth 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1958
WDN   w/e 23/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Broadheath-Lymm-Warrington Section The local passenger service to and from Manchester (London Road) continues to be worked mainly by Fowler and Stanier 2-6-2T's, Stanier 2-6-4T's, ex L. & Y. 2-4-2T's and Class '2' 4-4-0 No. 674. The latter makes one 'afternoon trip from Warrington to London Road and back. Morning turns are usually handled by 2-6-2T's Nos. 2, 6 o 7 and one of the three ex-L. & Y. 2-4-2T's (Nos. 10697, 10703 or 10705). No. 71 (9A) is the most regular Stanier 2-6-2T, and 2606 (BA) the most usual 2-6-4T on duty. A couple of trips from Warrington to Broadheath and back are usually sandwiched in between its other duties by the Hartford motor train which is pushed or pulled by Webb 2-4-2T No. 6603 o 6668. The fairly heavy freight traffic is shared fairly equally between ex L.N.W. 0-8-0's and Class '8F' 2-8-0's, while the working of the Arpley-Broadheath tranships train is invariably entrusted to one of the several ex Midland Class '3' 0-6-0's shedded at Warrington SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 71
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40071    
22/03/1958 Allocation      
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
23/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40071    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev