Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 268 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5668 Week
» 23720 Month
» 256640 Year
» 1922016 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 72 on 15/02/1935
British Railways 40072 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 15/02/1935
Withdrawal Sat 01/09/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/02/1935
7B   Bangor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
1A   Willesden 2w/e 17/06/1950
1C   Watford w/e 30/09/1950
1C   Watford 4w/e 07/10/1950
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/11/1951
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/09/1954
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 09/12/1961
     Withdrawn on 01/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN WRX Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 28/01/1950
EXLOAN 7B Bangor w/e 15/04/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 1C Watford w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/11/1951
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 North Wales Bangor shed received on 6/9 two new Class '2P' 2-6-2T's, Nos. 41212 an 41213 . Both are in the new black livery, lined out in red, straw and grey, the numbers being on the tank sides below the cab window and not on the coal bunker as on the earlier examples of the Class. Both locomotives are fitted for 'push and pull' working, and are to work on the Amlwch and Bethseda branches. No. 41213 made her first trip on the Amlwch branch on 9/9 when she worked the 3.55 p.m. from Bangor. In spite of spending nearly ten minutes at Llangefni disposing of a loaded cattle truck and a large number of parcels and luggage, the arrival at Amlwch was only 6 minutes late. A small crowd of interested railwaymen and others witnessed her departure from Bangor. Until the arrival of these two new 2-6-2T's, traffic on the Amlwch branch has been shared between 2-6-2T No. 1200 and Webb 2-4-2T No. 46687. The latter, although so aged, puts up a good performance on the branch and was noted touching 60 m.p.h. between Gaerwen and Menai Bridge when working the 10.45 a.m. from Amlwch on 9/9. The thrice-weekly goods train on the Holland Arms-Red Wharf Bay branch is worked by either 'Cauliflower' No. 28553 or one of the two tank versions of the Class stationed at Bangor-Nos. 6899 an 6906. Trains from Bangor to Afon Wen are shortly to be worked through to Pwllheli by ex L.M.S. engines and on this account most of the 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor for this duty are to be transferred else-where, since they are not suitable for working over the old Cambrian section of the former G.W.R. They are to be replaced by Stanier 2-6-2T's which will augment the few already there which include Nos. 72 an 124. 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor include Nos. 2258, 2259, 2260, 2261 an 2628. Bangor's rapidly dwindling band of Webb 'coal tanks' include Nos. 7730, 7765 an 7822. Three ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's, Nos. 12119, 12176 an 12407, are also at Bangor for short distance goods haulage. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 72
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40072    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
01/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40072    
05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev