Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 73 on 20/02/1935
British Railways 40073 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/02/1935
Withdrawal Sat 18/08/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/02/1935
7B   Bangor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
1A   Willesden 2w/e 17/06/1950
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 05/05/1951
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 19/05/1951
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 26/01/1952
2A   Rugby 4w/e 26/03/1955
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 21/05/1955
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 11/08/1956
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 01/11/1958
16C   Mansfield w/e 17/10/1959
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 18/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 26/01/1952
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 11/08/1956
LOAN 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 29/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1958
LOAN 16C Mansfield 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 18/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/08/1950 Unusual Workings Two unusual locomotives were noted near Euston on Tuesday, 15th August. Compound 40934 (35C) in a siding, south of Queen's Park Station: and 40073 (1A 7B) hauling empty stock up Camden Bank. Compounds numbered in the 40900-39 series have always been rare in this section. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 73
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40073    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
18/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40073    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev