Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4951 Week
» 16188 Month
» 249108 Year
» 1914484 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 74 on 25/02/1935
British Railways 40074 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 25/02/1935
Withdrawal Fri 17/11/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/02/1935
19G   Trafford Park (LMS) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20C   Royston w/e 21/02/1948
20E   Manningham 8w/e 14/06/1952
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 31/01/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 14/01/1961
56A   Wakefield w/e 24/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 17/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 19G Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC 20C Royston w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 03/12/1955
EXLOAN 20E Manningham 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   on 17/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/1961 Wakefield MPD(56A) 60140 (56C) was under repair on 26th August; of Wakefield's five passenger turns, four are allocated to Bls and one only to a 2-6-4T with the result that the 2-6-2Ts are out of use but only 40074/147/90 appear to be stored. Two jobs are still worked by 'Jinties', shed pilot and Batley no. 1 (Batley no. 2 is a J50). Wakefield's last two LYR locomotives are 52413/61 in store in the yard. SLS/196110
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Road) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 74
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)    
21/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40074    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
17/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40074    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev