Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 255 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5655 Week
» 23707 Month
» 256627 Year
» 1922003 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 75 on 05/03/1935
British Railways 40075 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/03/1935
Withdrawal Sat 08/07/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/03/1935
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 22/06/1946
19B   Sheffield Millhouses on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 02/04/1949
20D   Normanton w/e 07/07/1951
20D   Normanton 4w/e 17/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 08/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   on 07/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. SLS/196108
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard-intact) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 75
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40075    
02/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
08/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40075    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev