Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 76 on 02/03/1935
British Railways 40076 w/e 02/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 02/03/1935
Withdrawal Fri 20/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/03/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden w/e 19/06/1948
2E   Warwick w/e 19/03/1949
9G   Gorton w/e 15/11/1958
9A   Longsight w/e 14/03/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/06/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 09/04/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 23/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 20/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 76
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
19/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2E)    
02/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40076    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
20/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40076    
01/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev