Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 78 on 08/03/1935
British Railways 40078 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 11/01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/03/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden w/e 19/06/1948
2E   Warwick w/e 19/03/1949
9G   Gorton w/e 15/11/1958
9A   Longsight w/e 14/03/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/06/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 09/04/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 23/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 15/03/1947
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 78
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
19/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2E)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40078    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40078    
11/01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev