Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 835 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1909 Week
» 27270 Month
» 260190 Year
» 1925566 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 79 on 19/03/1935
British Railways 40079 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 19/03/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 17/12/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 19/03/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 09/08/1952
16D   Mansfield 4w/e 01/11/1952
16D   Mansfield 8w/e 29/11/1952
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/10/1946
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 16D Mansfield 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 79
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40079    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40079    
17/12/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev