Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 769 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1843 Week
» 27204 Month
» 260124 Year
» 1925500 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 80 on 18/03/1935
British Railways 40080 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/09/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 12/01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/03/1935
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 29/12/1951
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
3B   Bushbury 4w/e 26/02/1955
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 24/03/1956
3A   Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
1A   Willesden w/e 06/01/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 08/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 27/01/1962
WDN   w/e 08/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 80
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
03/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40080    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40080    
12/01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev