Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 23705 Month
» 256625 Year
» 1922001 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 81 on 27/03/1935
British Railways 40081 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/03/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/03/1935
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D   Nuneaton w/e 10/01/1948
1A   Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
5D   Stoke 8w/e 29/11/1952
9B   Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 27/12/1952
9B   Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 03/01/1953
24L     4w/e 22/03/1958
2B   Nuneaton w/e 20/02/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 16/04/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 18/06/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 17/09/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 11A Carnforth 4w/e 22/03/1958
LOAN 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 27/02/1960
EXLOAN 24L Carnforth 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 81
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
10/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40081    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
03/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
22/03/1958 Allocation      
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40081    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev