Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
82 |
on |
25/03/1935 |
British Railways |
40082 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Tue 25/03/1935 to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/02/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 30/03/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 82 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40082 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
27/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40082 |
|
|
30/03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|