Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 298 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5698 Week
» 23750 Month
» 256670 Year
» 1922046 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 83 on 27/03/1935
British Railways 40083 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 13/04/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/03/1935
7B   Bangor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3A   Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 03/02/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 03/03/1962
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 83
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40083    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
03/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40083    
13/04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev