Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 851 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1925 Week
» 27286 Month
» 260206 Year
» 1925582 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 84 on 02/04/1935
British Railways 40084 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/04/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/04/1935
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
3B   Bushbury 4w/e 30/01/1954
6K   Rhyl 4w/e 21/05/1955
9A   Longsight 4w/e 08/10/1955
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 84
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40084    
03/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
21/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40084    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev