Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 86 on 08/04/1935
British Railways 40086 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/04/1935
5F   Uttoxeter on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6G   Llandudno Junction 8w/e 11/07/1953
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 16/06/1956
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/11/1960
6A   Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961
8E   Northwich w/e 17/06/1961
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 12/08/1961
24L   Carnforth w/e 26/08/1961
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 23/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 02/09/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/01/1960 Wrexham G.C. After closure on 4th January, 1610, 3749/60, 4683, 5606/51, 6610, 8734 an 9610 were transferred to Croes Newydd, whilst 40085/110/26/205 are stored at latter shed. 40086, 82000/31 went to Machynlleth. SLS/196003
03/06/1961 Chester MPD As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 86
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40086    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
23/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40086    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev