Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 87 on 11/04/1935
British Railways 40087 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/04/1935
7A   Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7B   Bangor w/e 02/10/1948
1A   Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
1A   Willesden 2w/e 17/06/1950
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 01/11/1952
2B   Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952
24K   Preston w/e 10/12/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 11/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 02/03/1946
LOAN 7B Bangor w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/11/1952
LOAN 24K Preston 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 04/03/1961
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 87
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40087    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40087    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev