Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 23705 Month
» 256625 Year
» 1922001 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 88 on 12/04/1935
British Railways 40088 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 12/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Tue 11/12/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/04/1935
19G   Trafford Park (LMS) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke w/e 26/08/1950
5D   Stoke 4w/e 09/09/1950
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 19/05/1951
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 8w/e 29/11/1952
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 26/02/1955
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 04/03/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 26/08/1950
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 04/03/1961
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/11/1962 Derby Works (On Shed) Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 88
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40088    
26/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40088    
11/12/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev