Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 243 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5643 Week
» 23695 Month
» 256615 Year
» 1921991 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 89 on 17/04/1935
British Railways 40089 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/08/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/04/1935
19G   Trafford Park (LMS) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19D   Heaton Mersey w/e 27/11/1948
19D   Heaton Mersey 3w/e 11/12/1948
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 29/04/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 04/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 04/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 89
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40089    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
04/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40089    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev