Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 90 on 20/04/1935
British Railways 40090 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/04/1935
19D   Heaton Mersey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 27/11/1948
20A   Holbeck (MR) 3w/e 11/12/1948
20E   Manningham w/e 01/09/1951
20E   Manningham 4w/e 08/09/1951
27C   Southport 4w/e 03/12/1955
27C   Southport w/e 18/06/1960
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/07/1961
27C   Southport w/e 02/12/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 01/09/1951
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 90
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D)    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40090    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
08/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40090    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev