Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 277 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5677 Week
» 23729 Month
» 256649 Year
» 1922025 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 91 on 09/05/1935
British Railways 40091 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/05/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/05/1935
14C   St Albans on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town w/e 14/08/1948
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 30/01/1954
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 29/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 5w/e 30/01/1954
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1959
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/08/1959 Tredegar MPD (in store at Newport Pill) Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 91
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C)    
14/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40091    
10/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40091    
01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev