Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 92 on 16/05/1935
British Railways 40092 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/05/1935
Withdrawal Sat 20/05/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/05/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 23/01/1960
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 04/03/1961
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 18/03/1961
     Withdrawn on 20/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 01/04/1961
WDN   w/e 20/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 92
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40092    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
20/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40092    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev