Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 196 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17999 Week
» 71015 Month
» 190542 Year
» 3217395 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
94 |
on |
16/05/1935 |
British Railways |
40094 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 16/05/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 94 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40094 |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40094 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|